Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Beidle, Cassilly, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hester, Salling, Gallion, Carozza, Carter, Lee, Ready, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, West, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to provide a facility dog or therapy dog to a child witness in any circuit court proceeding or other related court process, meeting, or interview; providing participation in the Program by a circuit court is voluntary; requiring participating courts to adhere to the procedures adopted by the Administrative Office of the Courts; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement the Program and ensure the details are publicly available; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0311
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/17/2019
Legislative Date
10/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108579/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {423926/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (130-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/17/2019 10/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {108579/1 Adopted 10
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Floor Amendment {423926/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 10
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Text - Third - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 12
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Referred Judiciary 13
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {172819/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (130-0) 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49B
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Text - Chapter - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2016, 2017, 2019 )
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:19 PM