Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background Investigations
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a specified background investigation requirement to the application process for a State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency retailer license; authorizing the Director of the Agency to require specified applicants to submit fingerprints for specified records checks; requiring the Central Repository in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide the Agency with specified information; requiring the Agency to submit specified information and fees to the Central Repository; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/01/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/01/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2014 1/21/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 14
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM