Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Clarifying a provision authorizing a certain purchase of eligibility service credit in the Employees' Pension System for certain employment; providing that certain members of the Employees' or Teachers' Pension System who meet certain criteria may continue employment with certain participating employers of the State Retirement and Pension System without incurring a certain break in service following retirement from the Employees' or Teachers' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {474263/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Eligibility Service Credit - Clarification
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Favorable Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Second Reading Passed 22
Text - Third - Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Eligibility Service Credit - Clarification
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Referred Appropriations 26
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {474263/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Text - Chapter - Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM