Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062 /CH0483 (SB0119/CH0484)
Title
Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 /CH0203 (SB0306)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064 (SB0120/CH0204)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265 /CH0205 (SB0153)
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266 (SB0186/CH0206)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 /CH0207 (SB0179)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 (SB0828/CH0208)
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 /CH0347 (SB0829)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0209 (SB0827)
Title
State Police Retirement System - Employment of Retirees - Clarifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 (SB0486/CH0210)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 /CH0484 (HB0062/CH0483)
Title
Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0204 (HB0064)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0265/CH0205)
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 (HB0267/CH0207)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0206 (HB0266)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 (HB0063/CH0203)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0210 (HB0863)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0862/CH0209)
Title
State Police Retirement System – Employment of Retirees – Clarifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 /CH0208 (HB0860)
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB0861/CH0347)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0062 /CH0483 (SB0119/CH0484) Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0063 /CH0203 (SB0306) State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0064 (SB0120/CH0204) State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0265 /CH0205 (SB0153) Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0266 (SB0186/CH0206) State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0267 /CH0207 (SB0179) Optional Retirement Program - Regulations By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0860 (SB0828/CH0208) Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0861 /CH0347 (SB0829) State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0862 /CH0209 (SB0827) State Police Retirement System - Employment of Retirees - Clarifications By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0863 (SB0486/CH0210) State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
SB0119 /CH0484 (HB0062/CH0483) Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0120 /CH0204 (HB0064) State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0265/CH0205) Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 (HB0267/CH0207) Optional Retirement Program - Regulations By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 /CH0206 (HB0266) State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 (HB0063/CH0203) State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 /CH0210 (HB0863) State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0862/CH0209) State Police Retirement System – Employment of Retirees – Clarifications By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0828 /CH0208 (HB0860) Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0829 (HB0861/CH0347) State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM