Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law concerning a credit against the State income tax for specified preservation and conservation easements to allow an individual or a member of a pass-through entity to claim the credit for an easement conveyed to the Department of Natural Resources or specified organizations; requiring the Board of Public Works to approve tax credits on a first-come, first served basis; providing that the total amount of tax credits claimed by members of pass-through entities cannot exceed $200,000 per taxable year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0276
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0615 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555868/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 23
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {555868/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM