Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Historically and Architecturally Valuable Property
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 10% to 25%, the amount of restoration and preservation expenses for specified historic structures that the governing body of a county or municipal corporation may authorize to be claimed by specified taxpayers as a property tax credit against the county or municipal property tax; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0263
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Second Reading Passed 22
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 27
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM