Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh and Eckardt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for materials, parts, or equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or the avionics systems of aircraft if the materials, parts, or equipment are installed on the aircraft; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly by December 31 each year on the amount of sales and use tax revenue lost from the exemption and any change to the number of aviation technicians employed in the state as a result of the exemption; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0318
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0159 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 28
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-234 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM