Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 22
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 24
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 26
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
(   8-412 )
(   10-207, 10-731, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page