Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0059 (SB0059)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0068/CH0059)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 /CH0021
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 /CH0022
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 /CH0059 (SB0059) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 (HB0068/CH0059) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 /CH0021 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 /CH0022 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM