Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Augustine, and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State and certain units and instrumentalities of the State from using any appropriation for a magnetic levitation transportation system in the State; prohibiting a public or private entity that receives money from the State from authorizing a permit or giving any other form of approval for a magnetic levitation transportation system in the State; and prohibiting a proposal for a magnetic levitation transportation system from using certain rights-of-way or track owned or operated by Amtrak or CSX transportation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0715
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0200 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:57 PM