Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain requirement that the Department of Legislative Services publish and index the titles of municipal charter amendments and local laws of charter and code counties in the Session Laws of the General Assembly; making certain conforming changes; and requiring the Department to publish the titles or the full text of municipal charter amendments and local laws of charter and code counties on the General Assembly website.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0500
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46A
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text - Chapter - Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-214, 4-311, 9-207, 9-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM