Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 (SB0094/CH0005)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500 (SB0286/CH0263)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 /CH0199 (SB0438)
Title
Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952 /CH0201 (SB0440)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0439/CH0200)
Title
State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0347/CH0198)
Title
State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100 /CH0719 (SB0585/CH0720)
Title
State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 /CH0722 (SB0671/CH0723)
Title
State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 /CH0263 (HB0500)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0198 (HB1099)
Title
State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0951/CH0199)
Title
Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0200 (HB0953)
Title
State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 (HB0952/CH0201)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 /CH0007
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0008
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 /CH0720 (HB1100/CH0719)
Title
State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0723 (HB1114/CH0722)
Title
State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 (SB0094/CH0005) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0500 (SB0286/CH0263) Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0951 /CH0199 (SB0438) Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0952 /CH0201 (SB0440) State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0953 (SB0439/CH0200) State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1099 (SB0347/CH0198) State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1100 /CH0719 (SB0585/CH0720) State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1114 /CH0722 (SB0671/CH0723) State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0286 /CH0263 (HB0500) Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0347 /CH0198 (HB1099) State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0438 (HB0951/CH0199) Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0439 /CH0200 (HB0953) State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0440 (HB0952/CH0201) State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0579 /CH0007 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 7
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0580 /CH0008 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 8
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0585 /CH0720 (HB1100/CH0719) State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0671 /CH0723 (HB1114/CH0722) State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM