Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Corporation Returns - Filing Date
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending by 1 month the date by which specified corporations must complete and file with the Comptroller an income tax return; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349037/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {349037/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
(   10-821 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page