Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the Maryland Horse Industry Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2026, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2023; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824034/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {824034/1 Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 27
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-719, 6-107.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM