Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0408
Title
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 (SB0292/CH0051)
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 (SB0297/CH0053)
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 /CH0092 (SB0296)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 (SB0294/CH0052)
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 /CH0093 (SB0295)
Title
State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 (SB0893/CH0355)
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0044
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0045
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 /CH0051 (HB0253)
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0294 /CH0052 (HB0256)
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0258/CH0093)
Title
State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 (HB0255/CH0092)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0053 (HB0254)
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0355 (HB0823)
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0511 /CH0408 State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 (SB0292/CH0051) State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0254 (SB0297/CH0053) State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0255 /CH0092 (SB0296) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0256 (SB0294/CH0052) Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0258 /CH0093 (SB0295) State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0823 (SB0893/CH0355) Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 /CH0044 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0184 /CH0045 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0292 /CH0051 (HB0253) State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0294 /CH0052 (HB0256) Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0258/CH0093) State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 (HB0255/CH0092) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0297 /CH0053 (HB0254) State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0893 /CH0355 (HB0823) Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM