Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Election Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Senators Miller and Dyson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the compensation for chief election judges and election judges in Calvert County; and providing that the Act does not apply to the compensation of the incumbent chief election judges or election judges in Calvert County.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 37
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 69
Senate 4/09/2013 4/07/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM