Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a participating employer to submit supporting payroll data to the State Retirement Agency regarding a member's contributions at the time contributions are paid to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and providing, for violations of the Act, a 10% penalty of the member contribution due, 10% a year interest on delinquent member contributions until paid, a $250 penalty for each payroll for which supporting data is not submitted, and 10% a year interest on a certain penalty assessed under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0063
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {869632/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM