Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the Somerset County Liquor Control Board reserve fund from up to $150,000 to up to $300,000; and increasing the maximum amount of money from $50,000 to $100,000, the Liquor Control Board may distribute from the reserve fund to a dispensary.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0291
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Text - Chapter - Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   29-102, 29-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM