Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Sponsored by
Senators West, Waldstreicher, Washington, Kagan, and Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county to address, in a recycling plan required to be submitted to the Secretary of the Environment, the collection and recycling of recyclable materials from buildings that are 150,000 square feet or greater of office space; requiring each owner of an office building to provide recycling receptacles for the collection of recyclable materials and for the removal of certain materials for further recycling by October 1, 2021; authorizing certain enforcement units to conduct certain inspections; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019, October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Recycling - Commercial Properties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {570317/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-30)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Recycling - Commercial Properties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {154032/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Text - Third - Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {570317/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-30) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Text - Chapter - Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1701, 9-1703, 9-1714 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM