Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Astle, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Madaleno, Ramirez, Young, Zucker, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Complete Streets Program to provide matching grants to certified jurisdictions to promote healthy communities; providing for program funds to be provided by the Governor in the State budget; specifying the requirements for a local government to be designated as a certified jurisdiction; authorizing a certified jurisdiction to apply for matching grants from the Program; requiring the Department of Transportation to issue a report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0535
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327174/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450213/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-16)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {327174/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {450213/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-16) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-901 through 8-908 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM