Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the licensing and regulation of security systems technicians in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Secretary of State Police to license and regulate security systems technicians; and requiring that an evaluation of the licensing and regulation of security systems technicians be performed on or before December 15, 2028.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 32
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed 32
Text - Third - Security Systems Technicians - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Economic Matters 36
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM