Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and McCray
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain short-term rental platforms to collect the sales and use tax on the sale of the right to occupy certain short-term rentals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential Lodging
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869532/3
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869532/3 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-3)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential Lodging
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {869532/3 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {869532/3 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-3) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM