Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Eckardt, Edwards, Hayes, Hester, Rosapepe, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending certain benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders Program to businesses that locate or expand in opportunity zones in the State; establishing the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program in the Department and providing for the administration of the tax credit enhancements offered by the Program; authorizing an additional tax credit under the historic revitalization tax credit program for certain commercial rehabilitations that qualify as opportunity zone projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {639634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {403223/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {623828/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {123229/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {615969/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {493523/2 (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic and Community Development Tax Credits - Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {639634/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Floor Amendment {403223/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Floor Amendment {623828/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Floor Amendment {123229/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {615969/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Amendment {493523/2 (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text - Chapter - Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-704, 5-1303, 5-704, 6-1001 through 6-1008, 6-301, 6-402, 6-801, 6-803 through 6-805 )
(   2-301, 4-104, 4-223, 4-2501 through 4-2505, 4-508, 6-201, 6-206, 6-301, 6-303, 6-304, 6-305 )
(   5-7B-01, 5-7B-06, 5A-303, 7-314 )
(   10-741, 10-749, 11-411 )
(   9-110, 9-229, 9-230, 9-263 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM