Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Zucker, Brochin, Muse, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain persons to execute and record a restrictive covenant modification to an unlawfully restrictive covenant in a certain manner; requiring the governing body of a homeowners association to delete any recorded covenant or restriction that restricts ownership based on race, religious belief, or national origin from the common area deeds or other declarations of property in the development on or before September 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190311/3 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {488772/1 Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Text - Third - Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {190311/3 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11B-113.3, 3-102, 3-104, 3-112, 3-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM