Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization to use the most recent treatment criteria developed by the American Society of Addiction Medicine for addictive, substance-related, and co-occurring conditions for all medical necessity and utilization management determinations for substance use disorder benefits; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits - Requirements and Reports
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {737971/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM