Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing community schools in the State for the purpose of providing an integrated focus on academics, health and social services, youth and community development, and familial and community engagement; requiring a community school to have a community school coordinator with responsibility for developing and implementing a plan based on an assessment of needs for the community school; authorizing local school systems to form a school-community partnership for the planning and implementation of a community school; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0733
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {885762/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {524131/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {885762/1 Adopted 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text - Chapter - Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.9-101 through 9.9-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM