Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Beidle, Benson, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Kelley, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Waldstreicher, West, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the qualifications an individual must have to be appointed as a notary public; authorizing certain persons to charge a certain fee for the performance of a certain notarial act; authorizing a notarial officer to perform certain notarial acts except under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain individuals from charging a fee to perform a notarial act; providing for the manner in which notarial acts for remotely located individuals are to be performed except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {658472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {256988/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, West and Washington)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, West and Washington)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Johnson and Krebs)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Johnson and Krebs)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {173026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {173026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {658472/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {256988/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, West and Washington) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, West and Washington) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Recede 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Johnson and Krebs) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Johnson and Krebs) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Conference Committee Report {173026/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {173026/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Text - Chapter - State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-102, 18-103, 18-104, 18-105 through 18-108, 18-109, 18-110, 18-111, 18-112, 18-113, 18-114, 18-201 through 18-227, 19-101 through 19-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM