Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, subject to specified exceptions, a District Court Commissioner may be a resident of a county contiguous to the county in which the commissioner serves.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0476
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {913526/1 (Senator Ferguson)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {913526/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {632319/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {543520/1 (Delegate McCray) Withdrawn
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {933224/5 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-2)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 43
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {913526/1 (Senator Ferguson) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {913526/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 46
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 48
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {632319/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {543520/1 (Delegate McCray) Withdrawn 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted 66
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {933224/5 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (41-2) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Text - Chapter - District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM