Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for naming of the defendants in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property sold at a tax sale; and establishing requirements for filing a specified affidavit in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property sold at a tax sale.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Text - Chapter - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-836 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM