Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0794


CH0583

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the county boards of education in Caroline, Dorchester, Kent, Queen Anne's, and Talbot counties to establish a regional Career and Technical Education (CTE) school to provide career and technical education programs to public high school students in the counties; requiring a regional CTE school to operate under the terms of a certain collective bargaining agreement; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula for certain county boards of education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0603
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1002 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (130-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Ways and Means 49
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {675964/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (130-1) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-207 )
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:25 PM