Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 2/24/2021 2:04:34 PM
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:49 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
February 24, 2021 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0072
Sen Kagan

Open Meetings Act - Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
REMOVED: 9:49 AM

Change made: February 24, 2021 11:56 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0906
Sen Sydnor

Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners – Alterations
REMOVED: 11:56 AM

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 12:06 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
February 25, 2021 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD)
SB0070

Finance Committee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:12 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
February 25, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on SB 414

Rules Committee
Change made: February 24, 2021 11:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Rules Committee - Other
February 26, 2021 10:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB877 - Corrective
Sponsor hearings of bills for referral
SB878 - Curative

House
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Work Session
February 25, 2021 12:15 PM
Zoom / YouTube
- HBs 23 and 260

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Work Session
March 1, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Agenda to come.

Education Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0034
Del Rosenberg

State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
HB0071
Del Luedtke

Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
HB0072
Del Anderton

County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
HB0096
Dels Solomon and Rosenberg

Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Application
HB0181
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County – Board of Education – Election of Officers
HB0370
Del Kerr

Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
HB0377
Del Bagnall

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
HB0401
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
HB0461
Del Washington

Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
HB0522
Del Washington

Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
HB0700
Del Ruth

Education - Disruption of School Activities - Repeal of Prohibition

Election Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 11:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Election Law Subcommittee - Voting Session
February 25, 2021 12:40 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0656
Del Crosby

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Accessibility by Public Transportation
HB1048
Del Wilkins

Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List

Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee - Work Session
March 2, 2021 12:15 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Agenda to come.

MD Essential Worker Protection Act Workgroup
Change made: February 24, 2021 12:29 PM - HEARING ADDED
MD Essential Worker Protection Act Workgroup - Other
February 25, 2021 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB581 -Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: February 24, 2021 1:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
February 25, 2021 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0073
Del Krimm

State and Local Government and Private Employers – Teleworking

Public Safety Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Safety Subcommittee - Work Session
March 1, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 670

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 24, 2021 10:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Voting Session
February 25, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0114
Del Lierman, et al

Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
REMOVED: 10:57 AM

Other
Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Change made: February 24, 2021 11:05 AM - HEARING ADDED
Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup - Other
March 1, 2021 4:00 PM to March 1, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page