Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Wicomico County or the governing body of a municipal corporation in Wicomico County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property that is used for certain hotel or residential development projects that add substantially to the assessed value of the property; authorizing the governing body of Wicomico County or the governing body of a municipal corporation in Wicomico County to provide for certain matters relating to the property tax credit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1179
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:32 PM
Click to return on the top page