Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "Baltimore Convention site"; requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City to enter into an agreement to begin in fiscal year 2020 the planning and design of the expansion or renovation of the Baltimore Convention facility; and specifying that the agreement include a provision allocating two-thirds of the costs for planning and design to the Authority and one-third of the costs to Baltimore City.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {429931/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM