Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0797)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Crane Located on State Property - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0800)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB0800)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Crane Located on State Property - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB0801/CH0695)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1190)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0800 (SB0797) Property Tax - Exemption for Crane Located on State Property - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 (SB0800) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0797 (HB0800) Property Tax - Exemption for Crane Located on State Property - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 (HB0801/CH0695) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1190) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM