Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment – Definitions – Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "harassment" and defining "sexual harassment" for purposes of certain provisions relating to discrimination in employment to include conduct, which need not be severe or pervasive, that consists of unwelcome sexual advances, requests for sexual favors, or other conduct of a sexual nature under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "sexual harassment" for certain provisions relating to State government sexual harassment prevention training; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harassment and Sexual Harassment – Definitions – Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {553323/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harassment and Sexual Harassment – Definitions – Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Economic Matters 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page