Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $100,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Havre de Grace and the Board of Directors of the Susquehanna Hose Company, Inc. for a fire and rescue boat for the Lower Susquehanna River and Upper Chesapeake Bay and their tributaries, including site improvements to and construction, repair, and renovation of a boat dock and boat launch for the fire and rescue boat, located in Harford County and Cecil County; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM