Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from driving or attempting to drive an all-terrain vehicle or a snowmobile on portions of a highway in the State on which an all-terrain vehicle or a snowmobile is authorized unless the individual holds a driver's license or is specifically exempted; applying specified provisions of law relating to the operation of a snowmobile to the operation of an all-terrain vehicle; prohibiting a person under 16 years of age from operating specified vehicles on public property unless accompanied by a specified adult; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608170/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {890317/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {608170/1 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {608170/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 48
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {890317/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-103.3, 16-101, 21-104.1, 21-1130, 25-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM