Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2010, 2012, and 2013 - Maryland Historical Trust Easements
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2010, 2012, and 2013 to provide that the Board of Trustees of Goucher College and the Board of Directors of the Fashion, Architecture and Basic Design School, Inc., for purposes of specified grants, may only be required to grant and convey to the Maryland Historical Trust a perpetual preservation easement on specified structures that benefit from the grants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2010, 2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM