Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Program to focus on preventing and ending youth homelessness in the State and addressing disparities based on race, ethnicity, sexual orientation, and gender identity; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Program; establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Fund; requiring, in and after the third year of funding, the Department to allocate 50% of the money appropriated to the Fund for certain housing programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {807679/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Text - Third - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Text - Chapter - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11.5-101 through 11.5-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM