Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the juvenile court to inquire as to the educational stability of a child at specified hearings and proceedings; and authorizing the juvenile court to consider specified factors in determining the educational stability of a child.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0064
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/12/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-3)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/12/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (117-3) 27
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 26
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM