Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Arts Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Sophocleus, and Love
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of State Debt in the amount of $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Chesapeake Arts Center, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Chesapeake Arts Center, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0081
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2015 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 171). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 171 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM