Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility suitable for changing the diaper of an adult be installed in newly constructed public buildings or public restrooms, or in a public restroom that undergoes substantial renovation, after October 1, 2020; requiring certain entities to report to the Department of General Services the location of a suitable adult diaper-changing facility; requiring the Department to maintain a list of the locations of diaper-changing facilities on its website; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0044
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/20/2019
Legislative Date
7/20/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/20/2019 7/20/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM