Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Brooks, Bagnall, and Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility for a certain veteran to reside at a home for veterans that is supervised by the Department of Veterans Affairs to include a certain veteran of active service with a uniformed service of the United States, including the Army, Marine Corps, Navy, Air Force, Coast Guard, Public Health Service Commissioned Corps, and the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2019
Legislative Date
10/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2019 10/25/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM