Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the presumption of compensability under the workers' compensation law to include, under specified conditions, State correctional officers who suffer from heart disease or hypertension resulting in partial or total disability or death; requiring current State correctional officers to submit specified medical information to the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services; allowing benefits under the Act to be added to retirement benefits subject to a specified limitation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0563 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/09/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/09/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-628 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM