Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to use a fair market value determined in accordance with certain provisions of law for up to 2 years after the date on which the Foundation was first requested in writing to purchase the easement.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0244
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1008 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM