Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Steering Committee of the Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators: requiring the Steering Committee to review, or request that the Alliance review, the content and monitor the implementation of the training objectives and curriculum adopted by the Police Training Commission for a community inclusion training program at least once every 4 years or more frequently if requested by the Commission.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0147
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0848 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/17/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116483/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/17/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 12:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {116483/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-128, 7-131 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM