Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Member Qualifications - Criminal Conviction Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a member of the Baltimore County Revenue Authority may not have been convicted of, or pleaded guilty or nolo contendere to, a felony or a misdemeanor other than a minor traffic violation; and requiring the Baltimore County Executive, after providing notice and an opportunity for a public hearing, to remove a member of the authority who has been convicted of, or pleaded guilty or nolo contendere to, a felony or a misdemeanor other than a minor traffic violation.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/26/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/26/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM