Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/21/2020 11:43:04 AM
Friday, February 21, 2020
Friday, February 21, 2020
Senate
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 3, 2020 2:30 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital PAYGO Decision Meeting

Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 21, 2020 11:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
University of Baltimore
University of Maryland Baltimore County
Maryland Technology Development Corporation

Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 21, 2020 12:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
University of Baltimore
University of Maryland Baltimore County
Maryland Technology Development Corporation

Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 28, 2020 11:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Historic St Mary's City Commission
Maryland Stadium Authority
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
State Treasurer
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
Maryland School for the Deaf
Department of Commerce

Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 28, 2020 12:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Historic St Mary's City Commission
Maryland Stadium Authority
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
State Treasurer
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
Maryland School for the Deaf
Department of Commerce

Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 3, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
EBA Decision Meeting

Finance Committee
Change made: February 21, 2020 9:47 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0905
Sen Smith

State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
REMOVED: 7:33 AM
SB0810
Sen Waldstreicher

State Highway Administration - Electronic Signs Along Highways - Suicide Prevention
ADDED: 9:47 AM

Change made: February 21, 2020 9:46 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0810
Sen Waldstreicher

State Highway Administration - Electronic Signs Along Highways - Suicide Prevention
REMOVED: 9:46 AM

Health and Human Services Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 3, 2020 1:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
HHS Decision Meeting

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 3, 2020 2:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
PSTE Decision Meeting

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 21, 2020 9:04 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 25, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0713
Del Boyce, et al

Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
REMOVED: 9:04 AM

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: February 21, 2020 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0466
Del Arentz, et al

Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspector
REMOVED: 10:08 AM
HB0686
Del Arentz, et al

Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
REMOVED: 10:08 AM

Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 21, 2020 9:39 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2020 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
HB0119
Del Rosenberg, et al

Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
REMOVED: 9:39 AM