Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, to the extent practicable, the members of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission reflect the racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1648 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM