Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on the Board of License Commissioners for Queen Anne's County from issuing a license to an establishment located within 500 feet of a place of worship.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2019
Legislative Date
10/24/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2019 10/24/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM